List of victorian ministers
WebThe Minister for Agriculture is a minister within the Cabinet of Victoria tasked with the responsibility of overseeing the Victorian Government's agriculture initiatives. The minister is supported by the Department of Energy, Environment and Climate Action's Agriculture Victoria. The current minister is Gayle Tierney since June 2024. ... Web30 mrt. 2024 · the Governor of Victoria Departments and other bodies - includes each department's ministers, parliamentary secretaries and key staff; divisions, branches and …
List of victorian ministers
Did you know?
WebMinister for Education and Training 18 January 1991 28 January 1992 1 year, 10 days 16 Neil Pope MP: Minister for School Education 28 January 1992 6 October 1992 252 days 17 Don Hayward MP: Liberal: Minister for Education 6 October 1992 3 April 1996 3 years, 180 days 18 Phil Gude MP: 3 April 1996 20 October 1999 3 years, 200 days 19
WebChicago 264 views, 3 likes, 12 loves, 53 comments, 2 shares, Facebook Watch Videos from St. Katharine Drexel Parish of Chicago: Easter Sunday 2024 WebThis list details chief ministers of Indian states and union territories who have served for the longest years consecutively or otherwise.. This list includes chief ministers who have served for more than 10 years in office. As of April 2024, 46 ministers have served for more than 10 years; of which only four have been female chief ministers: Sheila Dikshit …
Web9 jan. 2014 · Agriculture Minister says 2014 big year for Victoria. Wild dog control, changes to the water act, creation of a poppy industry and concerns of irrigators are on the list of issue the Victorian ... WebFrom becoming queen on 6 February 1952, Elizabeth II was head of state of 32 independent states; at the time of her death, there were 15 states, called Commonwealth …
WebMembers of the Parliament of Victoria. Ministers of the Victoria (Australia) state government.
Web24 jun. 2024 · Four of Victoria's most senior government ministers have stepped down from their portfolios and will resign at the November election Those ministers are Deputy Premier and Education Minister James Merlino, Health Minister Martin Foley, Police Minister Lisa Neville and Sports Minister Martin Pakula cindy islerWeb1 uur geleden · Ukraine will not settle for any other decision of the NATO summit in Vilnius in July than real steps towards its membership in the Alliance. Source: Dmytro Kuleba, … diabetic and urinating a lotWebView the department's ministers and parliamentary secretaries, covering portfolios such as creative industries, employment and regional development. Menu. What we do; Priorities … cindy in hollyoaksWeb18 nov. 2024 · Ministers (Victoria's Cabinet) The Premier appoints Ministers, who are allocated responsibility for specific areas of government. Ministers are members of Cabinet. General orders General orders list which ministers have responsibility for all current … cindy jacke bioreference laboratoriesWebEvery year, the Ontario government publishes its annual Sunshine List of public sector servants with six-figure salaries. According to the document, Ministry of Labour / Ministère du Travail's 220 staffers made the Sunshine List, earning total compensation of $25,688,675.95 in 2024. diabetic and want raspberriesWebParliamentary secretary. Shadow minister. Cabinet and shadow cabinet. Frontbencher. Backbencher. Crossbencher. Leader of the House (Assembly) and … cindy islandWeb4 apr. 2024 · The Minister for Racing is a minister within the Cabinet of Victoria. Ministers for Racing. Order MP Party affiliation Ministerial title Term start Term end Time in office Notes 1 Tom Reynolds MP: Liberal: Minister for Sport, Recreation and Racing: 6 October 1992 3 April 1996 cindy jackson a brewton alabama